+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 26, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0331
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2005
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2005
- Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 027-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Restores language providing that these lights are prohibited whether lighted or unlighted, except on specified vehicles. Provides that the exemption applies to vehicles owned or operated (rather than owned or fully operated) by specified persons. Provides that a person using these lights in accordance with the provision must carry an identification card or letter identifying the bona fide member of a fire department or other specified agency that owns or operates the vehicle (rather than identifying the person using the lights as a member of a bona fide fire department or other specified agency).
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-215 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-215