+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Remains in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Residential Real Property Disclosure Act. Adds definition of "toxic mold".
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor