+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 008-006-000
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 210 ILCS 45/2-207.1 new -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-206 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4153-206