+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan