+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Motion Withdrawn Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Unes
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor