+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 7, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0135
- Effective Date July 7, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Local Government Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Local Government Committee
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that in certain municipalities and fire protection districts, the probationary employment period may be extended beyond 12 months for a firefighter who is required, as a condition of his or her employment, to be a certified paramedic, but the firefighter may only be discharged without a hearing during the extended probationary period if the firefighter fails to meet the paramedic certification requirements (now, the probationary period limitation does not apply to a fireman whose position also includes paramedic responsibilities). Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/10-2.1-4 - from Ch. 24, par. 10-2.1-4
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2005: HB1500 - Third Reading - Monday, May 16, 2005
March 16, 2005: HB1500 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 16, 2005
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor