+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (67)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0263
- Effective Date July 22, 2003
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 110-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 110-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 110-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Registration and Regulation Committee; 015-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Registration and Regulation Committee; 015-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Registration and Regulation Committee; 015-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Link
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 and 4
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Adopted Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-018-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
In the Fireworks Displayer Licensing Act, provides that after December 1, 2003, all pyrotechnic displays, both indoor and outdoor, must comply with the requirements set forth in the Act (instead of prohibiting a person from engaging in pyrotechnic display after that date without first submitting certain information to the Office of the State Fire Marshal and obtaining a license). Provides that after July 1, 2004, a pyrotechnic distributor may sell to anyone who presents a current BATF license (eliminates the presentation of a user permit as an alternative) and a local fireworks display permit from the local fire chief (instead of from the local authority having jurisdiction). In provisions amending the Fireworks Use Act with respect to the issuance of a public fireworks display permit, requires a site inspection to determine that the display will be in full compliance with the 2000 edition of the National Fire Protection Association 1123 Code for Fireworks Display or with the 2001 edition of the National Fire Protection Association Standard for the Use of Pyrotechnics before a Proximate Audience.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Pyrotechnic Operator Licensing Act. Regulates lead pyrotechnic operators through licensure requirements. Provides requirements for persons assisting lead pyrotechnic operators. Amends the Illinois Explosives Act. Provides that no person shall possess, use, purchase, or transfer explosive material unless licensed under the Act or the Pyrotechnic Operator Licensing Act. Amends the Fireworks Use Act. Makes changes to provisions concerning who shall handle fireworks displays and permit requirements. Requires that indoor pyrotechnic displays be conducted in buildings protected by automatic sprinkler systems. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Makes a change in the definition of "display fireworks".
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Makes a change in the definition of "display fireworks".
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 225 ILCS 210/1003 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 1-1003
- 425 ILCS 35/2 - from Ch. 127 1/2, par. 128