+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-000-000
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/12-3.05 - was 720 ILCS 5/12-4
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2019: HB1482 - Third Reading
March 26, 2019: HB1482 - Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal
March 26, 2019: HB1482 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor