+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 2, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 30 ILCS 120/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 651
+ − Vote
February 6, 2019: HB0148 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor