+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Constitutional Law Subcommittee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- To Constitutional Law Subcommittee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor