+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-005-000
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/12C-5 - was 720 ILCS 5/12-21.6
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-7