+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 022-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J Verschoore
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes a change that provides that any electric or gas public utility with fewer than 200,000 customers in Illinois on January 1, 2007 that offers energy efficiency programs to its customers in a state adjacent to Illinois may seek the approval of the Illinois Commerce Commission to offer the same or comparable energy efficiency programs to its customers in Illinois (previously, the provision applied to public utilities with fewer than 150,000 customers).
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes a change that provides that any electric or gas public utility with fewer than 200,000 customers in Illinois on January 1, 2007 that offers energy efficiency programs to its customers in a state adjacent to Illinois may seek the approval of the Illinois Commerce Commission to offer the same or comparable energy efficiency programs to its customers in Illinois (previously, the provision applied to public utilities with fewer than 150,000 customers).