+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan