+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/8-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 8-6
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: HB1466 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor