+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor