+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (56)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Revenue
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Revenue.
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-022
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 007-000-000
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Steve Davis
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Churchill
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ralph C. Capparelli
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Joel Brunsvold
- Co-Sponsor Rep. James D. Brosnahan
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard T. Bradley
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Forby
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Delgado
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Renee Kosel
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Wyvetter H. Younge
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ricca Slone
- Co-Sponsor Rep. George Scully, Jr.
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kurt M. Granberg
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John Philip Novak
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Kurtz
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
+ − Statute Amended
- 320 ILCS 25/3.15 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 403.15
+ − Vote
March 13, 2003: HB1436 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 13, 2003
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor