+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Railroad Safety Committee; 005-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Railroad Safety Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Finance Act. Exempts the Grade Crossing Protection Fund from the Act's administrative charge-back provisions. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 120, par. 424
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB1422 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor