+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 009-002-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-11 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-11
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2021: HFA0001 - Child Care Access & Early Childhood
March 5, 2021: HB0141 - Child Care Access & Early Childhood
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor