+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
- Remains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-000-000
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2015: HB1404 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 17, 2015
March 10, 2015: HB1404 - Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal - Mar 10, 2015
March 10, 2015: HB1404 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 10, 2015
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor