+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the substantive provisions of the bill with changes. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2008 and through June 30, 2012, the Secretary of State must notify each owner of a licensed motor vehicle that many motor vehicles are capable of using E85 blended fuel. Sets forth requirements for the notice. Effective immediately.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the substantive provisions of the bill with changes. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2008 and through June 30, 2012, the Secretary of State must notify each owner of a licensed motor vehicle that many motor vehicles are capable of using E85 blended fuel. Sets forth requirements for the notice. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 18, 2007: HB1400 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 18, 2007
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor