+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 8, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0144
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 10, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 009-000-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 220/3.6 - from Ch. 127, par. 743.6