+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Larry McKeon
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- New Act -
- 35 ILCS 735/3-2 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-2
- 35 ILCS 735/3-3 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-3
- 35 ILCS 735/3-4 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-4
- 35 ILCS 735/3-5 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-5
- 35 ILCS 735/3-6 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-6
- 35 ILCS 735/3-7.5 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor