+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 25 ILCS 115/1 - from Ch. 63, par. 14
- 25 ILCS 120/7 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor