+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 30, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0559
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On July 6, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 7, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carolyn H. Krause
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Eliminates a Section of the bill pertaining to State facility construction contracts implementing design criteria that exceed contemporary standards for energy efficiency.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2007: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, June 07, 2007
May 25, 2007: HB1384 - Third Reading - Friday, May 25, 2007
March 22, 2007: HB1384 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor