+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Electric Utility Oversight Committee; 005-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Electric Utility Oversight Committee; 003-005-000
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Electric Utility Oversight Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Electric Utility Oversight Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Electric Utility Oversight Committee; 008-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Electric Utility Oversight Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor