+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 028-083-000
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -