+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 235 ILCS 5/1-3.05 - from Ch. 43, par. 95.05
- 235 ILCS 5/5-1 - from Ch. 43, par. 115
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor