+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0285
- Effective Date August 9, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011
- Do Pass Insurance; 008-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2011: HB1378 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 17, 2011
April 1, 2011: HB1378 - Third Reading - Friday, April 01, 2011
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor