+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 011-000-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
+ − Statute Amended
- 760 ILCS 100/2a - from Ch. 21, par. 64.2a
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor