+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-004-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 750 ILCS 60/Art. V heading new -
- 750 ILCS 60/501 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/505 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/510 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/515 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/520 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/525 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/530 new -
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207