+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland