+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Filed
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/9-219 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-219
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor