+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-000-025
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lovana Jones
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that effective July 1, 2003, the Department of Human Services shall increase TANF grant amounts by no less than 5% (instead of 15%) above the amounts in effect on June 30, 2003.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.11 - from Ch. 23, par. 12-4.11
+ − Vote
April 4, 2003: HB1360 - Third Reading - Friday, April 04, 2003
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor