+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/3-112 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-112
+ − Vote
March 27, 2019: HB1351 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor