+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (58)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0103
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 070-044-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 070-044-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-013-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michelle Mussman
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michelle Mussman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass Insurance; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Insurance
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-042-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that the bill takes effect on January 1, 2022, except that provisions amending the Illinois Insurance Code take effect on January 1, 2023 (rather than all provisions taking effect on January 1, 2023).
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2023 (rather than the effective date of the amendatory Act) shall provide coverage for health care or patient care services provided by a pharmacist if specified conditions are met (instead of coverage for patient care services provided by a pharmacist for hormonal contraceptives assessment and consultation). Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act to provide that nothing in the provisions concerning dispensation of hormonal contraceptives shall be interpreted to require a pharmacist to dispense hormonal contraception under a standing order issued by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches or the medical director of a local health department (rather than also under a standing order issued by the Medical Director of the Department of Public Health). Changes the definition of "practice of pharmacy". Effective January 1, 2023 (rather than January 1, 2022).
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Further amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Sets forth provisions concerning dispensation of hormonal contraceptives. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may adopt rules to implement the provisions. In provisions in the Illinois Public Aid Code concerning coverage for patient care services for hormonal contraceptives provided by a pharmacist, provides that the Department of Public Health (rather than the Director of Public Health) shall apply for any necessary federal waivers or approvals to implement the provisions by January 1, 2022. Provides that the Department shall submit to the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules administrative rules (rather than adopt administrative rules) as soon as practicable but no later than 6 months after federal approval is received (rather than no later than May 1, 2022). Removes changes to the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Removes language that provides that the provisions shall not be implemented until the receipt of all necessary federal waivers or approvals or until January 1, 2024, whichever comes first, and if federal approval is not obtained by January 1, 2024, the provisions shall be implemented using State funds.