+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-001-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 620 ILCS 35/5 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 755
- 620 ILCS 35/15 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 765