+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor