+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 3, 2005 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On November 2, 2005 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Lost 062-047-002
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 19, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Renee Kosel
On October 15, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 25, 2005
On September 8, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Renee Kosel
On August 15, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 16, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000
On May 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2005
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Transportation; 009-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2005
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 2, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-002-001
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 026-001-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John J. Millner
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/15-111 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 15-111