+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0523
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 1, 2008
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-006-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Dunn
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2007
- Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2007
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Joe Dunn
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the State Finance Act and the Department of Human Services (Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Changes the name of the "Illinois Special Olympics Checkoff Fund" to the "Special Olympics Illinois Fund". Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of Law Enforcement Torch Run For Special Olympics license plates. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $45 for original issuance of the plates, of which $30 shall be deposited into the Special Olympics Illinois Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $27 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $25 shall be deposited into the Special Olympics Illinois Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.