+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Availability and Access Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.