+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland
- Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Mike Boland
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor