+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 4, 2005 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0454
- Effective Date August 4, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 16, 2005 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2005
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2005
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-002-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-034-000
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 007-003-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 410/6 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 7106