+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2019: HB0013 - Third Reading
March 6, 2019: HB0013 - Health Care Licenses
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor