+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0095
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 12, 2011
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 098-018-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-018-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 013-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment & Energy Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment & Energy Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-005-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Reitz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Reitz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 010-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 010-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2011
- Do Pass Energy; 012-000-000
- Assigned to Energy
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2011
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to provide permit applicants with a draft permit before releasing the draft to the public. Requires the Agency, upon request of the permit applicant, to provide to the applicant a copy of the final permit before it is publicly issued. Authorizes permit applicants to propose language to be included in permits. Requires the Agency to create a web portal to enhance the permit review process. Requires the Agency, upon the request of a permit applicant, to post the name of the analyst assigned to review a permit. Authorizes the Agency to issue guidance documents and procedural rules to implement the issuance of permits under the Act. Authorizes the Agency to issue general permits and permits by rule (instead of requiring the issuance of site-specific permits). Requires the Agency to consult with the regulated community when identifying the types of permits for which general permits and permits by rule are appropriate. Authorizes permit applicants, by paying an additional fee, to obtain expedited permit review. Increases air pollution operating permit fees and CAAPP fees. Changes the time at which some of those fees must be paid and the manner in which one fee is calculated. Removes certain supplemental air pollution construction fees. Authorizes the owners of eligible sources, as determined by the Agency, to register annually with the Agency in lieu of obtaining an air pollution construction or operating permit. Specifies that certain permits are not required due to the emission of greenhouse gases. Specifies that greenhouse gas emissions do not count toward the emission caps on regulated air pollutants used to determine whether a stationary source is a small business stationary source. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Exempts specified guidance documents and rules of the Agency from certain rulemaking requirements. Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Specifies that 80% of the net revenue realized from the 6.25% general rate on the selling price of sorbents used in Illinois for sorbent injection (but no more than $2,000,000 in each fiscal year) must be deposited into the Clean Air Act (CAA) Permit Fund. Makes other changes. Effective July 1, 2011.
+ − Statute Amended
- 415 ILCS 5/39 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1039