+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0384
- Effective Date August 16, 2013
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013
- Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013
- Arrive in Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 014-002-000
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill and adds an immediate effective date.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: HB1295 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 30, 2013
March 8, 2013: HB1295 - Third Reading - Friday, March 08, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor