+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (96)
On August 12, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0758
- Governor Approved
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0758
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-001-000
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-001-000
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 19, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 010-005-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading September 9, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 010-005-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading September 9, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 19, 2015
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
- Assigned to Executive
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez Moved Note Request is Inapplicable
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 069-043-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-031-001
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-008-000
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the bill takes effect on January 1, 2017 (rather than upon becoming law).
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Domestic Workers' Bill of Rights Act. Sets forth the purpose and findings. Defines terms. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act, the Minimum Wage Law, the Wages of Women and Minors Act, and the One Day Rest in Seven Act to provide that domestic employees are included within the scope of those Acts. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 820 ILCS 130/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-1
- 820 ILCS 130/1 -
- 775 ILCS 5/2-101 - from Ch. 68, par. 2-101
- 820 ILCS 105/3 - from Ch. 48, par. 1003
- 820 ILCS 125/1 - from Ch. 48, par. 198.1
- 820 ILCS 140/2 - from Ch. 48, par. 8b
- New Act -
+ − Votes (7)
May 29, 2016: SFA0001 - Concurrence
May 11, 2016: HB1288 - Third Reading
August 19, 2015: HB1288 - Executive - Aug 19, 2015
May 29, 2015: HB1288 - Motion - Friday, May 29, 2015
May 29, 2015: HB1288 - Third Reading - Friday, May 29, 2015
May 19, 2015: HFA0001 - Labor & Commerce Committee - May 19, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB1288 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor