+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
On October 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
On July 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Lost 000-072-037
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 130/7 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-7
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2015: HFA0002 - Amendment - Thursday, May 14, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB1286 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor