+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0488
- Effective Date December 4, 2015; , some portions effective January 3, 2016.
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 110-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-006-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-048-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Deletes certain language regarding an individual's benefit amounts in calendar years 2016 and 2017. In provisions regarding discharge for misconduct, includes a list of work-related circumstances as misconduct. Sets forth when conduct is grossly negligent. Provides that none of the amount received by an individual as primary social security old age and disability retirement benefits shall constitute disqualifying income. Deletes language regarding increases in the adjusted state experience factor for calendar year 2016. Deletes language adding a surcharge to the contribution rate for certain employers for calendar year 2016. Effective immediately, except that certain provisions take effect January 3, 2016.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 820 ILCS 130/12 - from Ch. 48, par. 39s-12
- 820 ILCS 130/12 -
- 820 ILCS 405/401 - from Ch. 48, par. 401
- 820 ILCS 405/403 - from Ch. 48, par. 403
- 820 ILCS 405/602 - from Ch. 48, par. 432
- 820 ILCS 405/611 - from Ch. 48, par. 441
- 820 ILCS 405/1505 - from Ch. 48, par. 575
- 820 ILCS 405/1506.6 -