+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 290/0.1 - from Ch. 53, par. 0.1
+ − Vote
February 6, 2019: HB0128 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor