+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 12, 2011 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0318
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 15, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-022-000
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 012-004-000
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 120/2 - from Ch. 102, par. 42